MI HB4164 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary, With Substitute (h-4)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary, With Substitute (h-4)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Tobacco; retail sales; sale of electronic cigarette or any oral device that provides vapor nicotine to minors; prohibit, require sellers of liquid nicotine containers to ensure that the products meet certain requirements, and provide for other general amendments. Amends title & secs. 1, 2 & 4 of 1915 PA 31 (MCL 722.641 et seq.) & adds secs. 2b & 2c.
Title
Tobacco; retail sales; sale of electronic cigarette or any oral device that provides vapor nicotine to minors; prohibit, require sellers of liquid nicotine containers to ensure that the products meet certain requirements, and provide for other general amendments. Amends title & secs. 1, 2 & 4 of 1915 PA 31 (MCL 722.641 et seq.) & adds secs. 2b & 2c.
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Albert [R] | Rep. Elizabeth Griffin [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Yaroch [R] | Rep. Robert Wittenberg [D] |
Rep. Henry Vaupel [R] | Rep. Sue Allor [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary, With Substitute (h-4) |
2019-02-13 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/07/2019 |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2019-02-07 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduced By Representative Thomas Albert |
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-HB-4164 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2019-HIB-4164.htm |