MI HB4160 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-9)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-20 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary, With Substitute (h-1)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-20 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary, With Substitute (h-1)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes: other; definitions for certain crimes against vulnerable adults; provide for. Amends 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.1 - 7750.568) by adding sec. 145i. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4159'21
Title
Crimes: other; definitions for certain crimes against vulnerable adults; provide for. Amends 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.1 - 7750.568) by adding sec. 145i. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4159'21
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary, With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-02-09 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/04/2021 |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2021-02-04 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-02-04 | House | Introduced By Representative Julie Calley |