MI HB4158 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-10 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-10 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; forfeiture; asset forfeiture; require a criminal conviction before proceeding. Amends 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1101 - 333.25211) by adding secs. 7521a & 7521b.
Title
Criminal procedure; forfeiture; asset forfeiture; require a criminal conviction before proceeding. Amends 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1101 - 333.25211) by adding secs. 7521a & 7521b.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 277 (Y: 83 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-5 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-5 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-5 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-5 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2018-05-08 | House | Transmitted |
2018-05-08 | House | Title Amended |
2018-05-08 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 277 Yeas 83 Nays 26 |
2018-05-08 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-05-08 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-05-08 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-05-08 | House | Substitute H-5 Adopted |
2018-05-08 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-05-01 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-05-01 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-5 |
2017-02-07 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/02/2017 |
2017-02-02 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2017-02-02 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-02-02 | House | Introduced By Representative Peter Lucido |