MI HB4155 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-13 - Assigned Pa 26'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-13 - Assigned Pa 26'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Weapons; firearms; definition of firearm in the Michigan penal code; modify. Amends secs. 222, 226, 227b, 227c, 227d, 237a & 528a of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.222 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4151'15, HB 4152'15, HB 4153'15, HB 4154'15, HB 4156'15, SB 0085'15
Title
Weapons; firearms; definition of firearm in the Michigan penal code; modify. Amends secs. 222, 226, 227b, 227c, 227d, 237a & 528a of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.222 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4151'15, HB 4152'15, HB 4153'15, HB 4154'15, HB 4156'15, SB 0085'15
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-30 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 108 (Y: 90 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 115 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 22 (Y: 88 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 115 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 22 (Y: 88 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-13 | House | Assigned Pa 26'15 With Immediate Effect |
2015-05-13 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 5/12/2015 @ 5:13 Pm |
2015-05-13 | House | Approved By The Governor 5/12/2015 @ 4:44 Pm |
2015-05-12 | House | Presented To The Governor 5/8/2015 @ 9:58 Am |
2015-04-30 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2015-04-30 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2015-04-30 | House | Roll Call # 108 Yeas 90 Nays 20 |
2015-04-30 | House | Senate Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2015-04-29 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2015-04-29 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-2 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 115 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2015-02-26 | House | Transmitted |
2015-02-26 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 22 Yeas 88 Nays 21 |
2015-02-26 | House | Read A Third Time |
2015-02-25 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2015-02-25 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted And Amended |
2015-02-25 | House | Read A Second Time |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-02-18 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2015-02-10 | House | Printed Bill Filed 02/06/2015 |
2015-02-05 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2015-02-05 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-02-05 | House | Introduced By Representative Triston Cole |