MI HB4138 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-06 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-06 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Corrections; parole; criteria for placement on parole; modify. Amends secs. 11a, 20g, 33, 33e, 35, 39a & 40a of 1953 PA 232 (MCL 791.211a et seq.).
Title
Corrections; parole; criteria for placement on parole; modify. Amends secs. 11a, 20g, 33, 33e, 35, 39a & 40a of 1953 PA 232 (MCL 791.211a et seq.).
Sponsors
Rep. Kurt Heise [R] | Rep. Tim Kelly [R] | Rep. Harvey Santana [D] | Sen. Stephanie Chang [D] |
Sen. Michael Webber [R] | Rep. Dave Pagel [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-10-01 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 329 (Y: 67 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2015-10-01 | House | Transmitted |
2015-10-01 | House | Title Amended |
2015-10-01 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 329 Yeas 67 Nays 39 |
2015-10-01 | House | Read A Third Time |
2015-09-30 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2015-09-30 | House | Substitute H-4 Adopted |
2015-09-30 | House | Read A Second Time |
2015-06-16 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-06-16 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 |
2015-02-05 | House | Printed Bill Filed 02/05/2015 |
2015-02-04 | House | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2015-02-04 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-02-04 | House | Introduced By Representative Kurt Heise |