MI HB4137 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-06 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-06 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; probation; fixing period and conditions of probation; modify. Amends secs. 2, 4 & 14, ch. XI & secs. 2, 3 & 5, ch. XIA of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 771.2 et seq.).
Title
Criminal procedure; probation; fixing period and conditions of probation; modify. Amends secs. 2, 4 & 14, ch. XI & secs. 2, 3 & 5, ch. XIA of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 771.2 et seq.).
Sponsors
Rep. Martin Howrylak [R] | Rep. Kurt Heise [R] | Rep. Tim Kelly [R] | Rep. Anthony Forlini [R] |
Sen. Michael Webber [R] | Rep. Dave Pagel [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-10-01 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 331 (Y: 101 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2015-10-01 | House | Transmitted |
2015-10-01 | House | Title Amended |
2015-10-01 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 331 Yeas 101 Nays 5 |
2015-10-01 | House | Read A Third Time |
2015-09-30 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2015-09-30 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2015-09-30 | House | Read A Second Time |
2015-06-16 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-06-16 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2015-02-05 | House | Printed Bill Filed 02/05/2015 |
2015-02-04 | House | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2015-02-04 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-02-04 | House | Introduced By Representative Martin Howrylak |