MI HB4135 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-20 - Assigned Pa 32'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-20 - Assigned Pa 32'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; youthful trainees; revocation of trainee status under Holmes youthful trainee act for committing certain subsequent crimes; provide for. Amends sec. 12, ch. II of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 762.12).
Title
Criminal procedure; youthful trainees; revocation of trainee status under Holmes youthful trainee act for committing certain subsequent crimes; provide for. Amends sec. 12, ch. II of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 762.12).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-12 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 138 (Y: 84 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 160 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 30 (Y: 85 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 160 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 30 (Y: 85 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-20 | House | Assigned Pa 32'15 With Immediate Effect |
2015-05-20 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 5/20/2015 @ 1:42 Pm |
2015-05-20 | House | Approved By The Governor 5/20/2015 @ 1:14 Pm |
2015-05-20 | House | Presented To The Governor 5/14/2015 @ 3:16 Pm |
2015-05-12 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2015-05-12 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2015-05-12 | House | Roll Call # 138 Yeas 84 Nays 26 |
2015-05-12 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2015-05-07 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2015-05-07 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 160 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2015-03-12 | House | Transmitted |
2015-03-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 30 Yeas 85 Nays 25 |
2015-03-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2015-03-11 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted And Amended |
2015-03-11 | House | Read A Second Time |
2015-03-03 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-03-03 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2015-02-04 | House | Printed Bill Filed 02/04/2015 |
2015-02-03 | House | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2015-02-03 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-02-03 | House | Introduced By Representative Kurt Heise |