MI HB4134 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - Presented To The Governor 12/21/2018 @ 3:00 Pm
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - Presented To The Governor 12/21/2018 @ 3:00 Pm
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health occupations; physicians; continuing certification requirements for physicians; prohibit as basis for license or renewal. Amends 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1101 - 333.25211) by adding sec. 16147.
Title
Health occupations; physicians; continuing certification requirements for physicians; prohibit as basis for license or renewal. Amends 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1101 - 333.25211) by adding sec. 16147.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 855 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 668 (Y: 95 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 668 (Y: 95 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/21/2018 @ 3:00 Pm |
2018-12-28 | House | Assigned Pa 486'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-12-28 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/27/2018 @ 4:42 Pm |
2018-12-28 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/24/2018 @ 11:03 Am |
2018-12-19 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-19 | House | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-12-19 | House | Enrollment Vacated |
2018-12-19 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-19 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-12-19 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 855 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-12-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2018-12-04 | House | Transmitted |
2018-12-04 | House | Passed Roll Call # 668 Yeas 95 Nays 13 |
2018-12-04 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-12-04 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-04 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-12-04 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-12-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-12-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-02-01 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/31/2017 |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2017-01-31 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-01-31 | House | Introduced By Representative Edward Canfield |
Subjects
Health occupations: physicians
Occupations: individual licensing and regulation
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
Occupations: individual licensing and regulation
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs