MI HB4133 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure: sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for certain Michigan election law violations dealing with absent voter ballot applications; provide for. Amends sec. 11d, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.11d). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4132'21
Title
Criminal procedure: sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for certain Michigan election law violations dealing with absent voter ballot applications; provide for. Amends sec. 11d, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.11d). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4132'21
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 240 (Y: 65 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 240 (Y: 65 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Elections |
2021-05-26 | House | Transmitted |
2021-05-26 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 240 Yeas 65 Nays 44 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2021-05-26 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-05-25 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-05-25 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2021-05-25 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary, With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-02-09 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/04/2021 |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics |
2021-02-04 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-02-04 | House | Introduced By Representative Ann Bollin |