MI HB4131 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Assigned Pa 15'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Assigned Pa 15'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes: penalties; penalties related to a parolee in a medical facility; provide for. Amends 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.1 - 750.568) by adding sec. 197d. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4129'19
Title
Crimes: penalties; penalties related to a parolee in a medical facility; provide for. Amends 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.1 - 750.568) by adding sec. 197d. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4129'19
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - House - House Third Reading: Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 81 (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 55 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 18 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 55 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 18 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | House | Assigned Pa 15'19 With Immediate Effect |
2019-05-23 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 05/23/2019 08:24 Am |
2019-05-23 | House | Approved By The Governor 05/22/2019 03:51 Pm |
2019-05-14 | House | Presented To The Governor 05/10/2019 12:13 Pm |
2019-05-07 | House | Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 81 Yeas 109 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-05-07 | House | Rule Suspended |
2019-05-07 | House | Enrollment Vacated |
2019-05-02 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2019-05-02 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2019-05-02 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 55 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Amendment(s) |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Amendment(s) Concurred In |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Amendment(s) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2019-03-12 | House | Transmitted |
2019-03-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 18 Yeas 110 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-03-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-03-12 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2019-03-12 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-03-12 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2019-03-12 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-03-12 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-02-06 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/06/2019 |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2019-02-06 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-02-06 | House | Introduced By Representative Beth Griffin |