MI HB4129 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-10 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-10 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Elections: election officials; list of local clerks who are not current with continuing election education training; require secretary of state to post on department of state website. Amends 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.1 - 168.992) by adding sec. 33a.
Title
Elections: election officials; list of local clerks who are not current with continuing election education training; require secretary of state to post on department of state website. Amends 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.1 - 168.992) by adding sec. 33a.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 28 (Y: 87 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 28 (Y: 87 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Elections |
2021-03-09 | House | Transmitted |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 28 Yeas 87 Nays 22 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2021-03-09 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-03-03 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-02-23 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-02-09 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/04/2021 |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics |
2021-02-04 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-02-04 | House | Introduced By Representative Steve Marino |