MI HB4129 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Assigned Pa 13'2019 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Assigned Pa 13'2019 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Corrections; parole; procedures for parole of prisoner who is determined to be medically frail; revise. Amends sec. 35 of 1953 PA 232 (MCL 791.235). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4132'19, HB 4130'19
Title
Corrections; parole; procedures for parole of prisoner who is determined to be medically frail; revise. Amends sec. 35 of 1953 PA 232 (MCL 791.235). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4132'19, HB 4130'19
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 53 (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 16 (Y: 104 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 16 (Y: 104 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | House | Assigned Pa 13'2019 With Immediate Effect |
2019-05-23 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 05/23/2019 08:20 Am |
2019-05-23 | House | Approved By The Governor 05/22/2019 03:47 Pm |
2019-05-14 | House | Presented To The Governor 05/10/2019 12:09 Pm |
2019-05-02 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2019-05-02 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2019-05-02 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 53 Yeas 35 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2019-03-12 | House | Transmitted |
2019-03-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 16 Yeas 104 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-03-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-03-12 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2019-03-12 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-03-12 | House | Substitute (h-3) Adopted |
2019-03-12 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-03-12 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-3) |
2019-02-07 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/06/2019 |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2019-02-06 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-02-06 | House | Introduced By Representative Beau Lafave |