MI HB4126 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Assigned Pa 31'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Assigned Pa 31'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Marihuana; other; requirement for health warning labels on marihuana products sold in Michigan; provide for. Amends sec. 8 of 2018 IL 1 (MCL 333.27958).
Title
Marihuana; other; requirement for health warning labels on marihuana products sold in Michigan; provide for. Amends sec. 8 of 2018 IL 1 (MCL 333.27958).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 29 (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-12-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 195 (Y: 105 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 195 (Y: 105 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | Assigned Pa 31'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-02-20 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 02/20/2020 09:14 Am |
2020-02-20 | House | Approved By The Governor 02/19/2020 01:50 Pm |
2020-02-11 | House | Presented To The Governor 02/06/2020 10:53 Am |
2020-02-04 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-02-04 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-02-04 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 195 Yeas 105 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2020-02-04 | House | Senate Substitute (s-2) Concurred In By 3/4 Vote |
2020-01-29 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2020-01-29 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-2) With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Passed By 3/4 Vote; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 29 Yeas 34 Nays 2 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2) |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Substitute (s-2) Concurred In |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2) |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2019-09-10 | House | Transmitted |
2019-09-10 | House | Passed By 3/4 Vote; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 195 Yeas 105 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2019-09-10 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-09-05 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-09-05 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2019-09-05 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-08-27 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-08-27 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2019-02-06 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/05/2019 |
2019-02-05 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2019-02-05 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-02-05 | House | Introduced By Representative Thomas Albert |