MI HB4116 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - Re-referred To Committee On Oversight, Reform, And Ethics
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - Re-referred To Committee On Oversight, Reform, And Ethics
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
State; interstate compacts and agreements; review by attorney general; require. Amends 1846 RS 12 (MCL 14.28 - 14.35) by adding sec. 32a.
Title
State; interstate compacts and agreements; review by attorney general; require. Amends 1846 RS 12 (MCL 14.28 - 14.35) by adding sec. 32a.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Opsommer [R] | Sen. Marty Knollenberg [R] | Rep. Bruce Rendon [R] | Rep. Robert Genetski [R] |
Rep. Bill Rogers [R] | Rep. David Agema [R] | Rep. Kurt Damrow [R] | Rep. Joel Johnson [R] |
Sen. Kevin Daley [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-06-14 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 482 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 529 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 16 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 529 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 16 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-18 | House | Re-referred To Committee On Oversight, Reform, And Ethics |
2012-07-18 | House | Vetoed By The Governor 06/28/2012 |
2012-07-18 | House | Presented To The Governor 6/21/2012 @ 3:18 Pm |
2012-06-14 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2012-06-14 | House | Roll Call # 482 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2012-06-14 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2012-06-14 | House | Rule Suspended |
2012-06-14 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2012-06-14 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 529 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-06-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2012-06-13 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2012-06-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-05-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-05-23 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-05-23 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2012-01-31 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2012-01-26 | House | Transmitted |
2012-01-26 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 16 Yeas 106 Nays 0 |
2012-01-26 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-01-25 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-01-25 | House | Substitute H-6 Adopted |
2012-01-25 | House | Substitute H-2 Not Adopted |
2012-01-25 | House | Read A Second Time |
2011-11-08 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2011-11-08 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2011-01-25 | House | Printed Bill Filed 01/21/2011 |
2011-01-20 | House | Referred To Committee On Oversight, Reform, And Ethics |
2011-01-20 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-01-20 | House | Introduced By Representative Paul Opsommer |
Subjects
Legislature, reports
State agencies (existing), attorney general
State, interstate compacts and agreements
State agencies (existing), attorney general
State, interstate compacts and agreements