MI HB4105 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-06-07 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Local government; other; sanctuary policy prohibition act; create. Creates new act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local government; other; sanctuary policy prohibition act; create. Creates new act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-07HouseReferred To Second Reading
2017-06-07HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1
2017-01-31HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 01/26/2017
2017-01-26HouseReferred To Committee On Local Government
2017-01-26HouseRead A First Time
2017-01-26HouseIntroduced By Representative Pamela Hornberger

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback