MI HB4103 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on December 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-31 - Assigned Pa 175'19
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Crimes; credit cards; crimes involving credit cards; include cryptocurrency and distributed ledger technology in definition section of credit chapter in penal code. Amends sec. 157m of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.157m).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes; credit cards; crimes involving credit cards; include cryptocurrency and distributed ledger technology in definition section of credit chapter in penal code. Amends sec. 157m of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.157m).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-12-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 343 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 38 (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Judiciary (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-31HouseAssigned Pa 175'19
2019-12-31HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 12/20/2019 01:18 Pm
2019-12-31HouseApproved By The Governor 12/20/2019 12:00 Pm
2019-12-19HousePresented To The Governor 12/13/2019 02:45 Pm
2019-12-10HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2019-12-10HouseFull Title Agreed To
2019-12-10HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title
2019-12-10SenateInserted Full Title
2019-12-10SenatePassed Roll Call # 343 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2019-12-05SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2019-12-05SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2019-11-12SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2019-11-12SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2019-04-10SenateReferred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety
2019-04-09HouseTransmitted
2019-04-09HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 38 Yeas 108 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
2019-04-09HouseRead A Third Time
2019-03-20HousePlaced On Third Reading
2019-03-20HouseRead A Second Time
2019-03-19HouseReferred To Second Reading
2019-03-19HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2019-03-13HouseReported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Judiciary
2019-02-05HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 01/29/2019
2019-01-29HouseReferred To Committee On Financial Services
2019-01-29HouseRead A First Time
2019-01-29HouseIntroduced By Representative Vanessa Guerra

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-HB-4103
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2019-HIB-4103.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2019-HEBH-4103.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2019-HEBS-4103.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/House/htm/2019-HNB-4103.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/publicact/htm/2019-PA-0175.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-03-19-028.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-04-09-031.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-11-12-108.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-12-10-114.htm

Bill Comments

feedback