MI HB4103 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes; penalties; penalties for removal of a parolee from a facility who was placed there as a condition of his or her parole; provide for. Amends 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.1 - 750.568) by adding sec. 197d. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4101'17
Title
Crimes; penalties; penalties for removal of a parolee from a facility who was placed there as a condition of his or her parole; provide for. Amends 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.1 - 750.568) by adding sec. 197d. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4101'17
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 136 (Y: 101 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 136 (Y: 101 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2018-03-07 | House | Transmitted |
2018-03-07 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 136 Yeas 101 Nays 7 |
2018-03-07 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-03-07 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-02-28 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-02-28 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-01-31 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/26/2017 |
2017-01-26 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2017-01-26 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-01-26 | House | Introduced By Representative Rob Verheulen |