MI HB4102 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Corrections; parole; corrections code of 1953; amend to implement medically frail parole. Amends secs. 33, 33b & 34 of 1953 PA 232 (MCL 791.233 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4101'17
Title
Corrections; parole; corrections code of 1953; amend to implement medically frail parole. Amends secs. 33, 33b & 34 of 1953 PA 232 (MCL 791.233 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4101'17
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 135 (Y: 95 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 135 (Y: 95 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2018-03-07 | House | Transmitted |
2018-03-07 | House | Title Amended |
2018-03-07 | House | Passed By 3/4 Vote; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 135 Yeas 95 Nays 13 |
2018-03-07 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-03-07 | House | Substitute H-3 Adopted And Amended |
2018-03-07 | House | Substitute H-2 Not Adopted |
2018-03-07 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-02-28 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-02-28 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2017-01-31 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/26/2017 |
2017-01-26 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2017-01-26 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-01-26 | House | Introduced By Representative Peter Lucido |