MI HB4091 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-31 - Assigned Pa 163'19
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-31 - Assigned Pa 163'19
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development: neighborhood enterprise zones; eligibility requirements; modify. Amends sec. 8 of 1992 PA 147 (MCL 207.778). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0319'19
Title
Economic development: neighborhood enterprise zones; eligibility requirements; modify. Amends sec. 8 of 1992 PA 147 (MCL 207.778). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0319'19
Sponsors
Rep. Beau LaFave [R] | Rep. Eric Leutheuser [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Yaroch [R] | Rep. Gregory Markkanen [R] |
Rep. Gary Howell [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-12-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 366 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-04 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 336 (Y: 75 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-04 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 336 (Y: 75 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 163'19 |
2019-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/20/2019 12:54 Pm |
2019-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/20/2019 12:28 Pm |
2019-12-19 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/13/2019 03:31 Pm |
2019-12-11 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2019-12-11 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2019-12-11 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 366 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-12-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2019-12-10 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2019-12-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2019-12-10 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic And Small Business Development |
2019-12-04 | House | Transmitted |
2019-12-04 | House | Title Amended |
2019-12-04 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 336 Yeas 75 Nays 30 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2019-12-04 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-12-04 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2019-12-04 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-12-04 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2019-12-04 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-12-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-12-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-10-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-01-24 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/24/2019 |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce And Tourism |
2019-01-24 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced By Representative Beau Lafave |