MI HB4089 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-12 - Assigned Pa 31'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-12 - Assigned Pa 31'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Highways; name; certain bridge in Jackson county; designate as the "Officer James Bonneau Memorial Bridge". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2080) by adding sec. 1077.
Title
Highways; name; certain bridge in Jackson county; designate as the "Officer James Bonneau Memorial Bridge". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2080) by adding sec. 1077.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 57 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 163 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 163 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-12 | House | Assigned Pa 31'14 With Immediate Effect |
2014-03-12 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 3/11/2014 @ 4:08 Pm |
2014-03-12 | House | Approved By The Governor 3/11/2014 @ 3:44 Pm |
2014-03-04 | House | Presented To The Governor 3/4/2014 @ 1:40 Pm |
2014-02-27 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-02-27 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-02-27 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 57 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2013-05-22 | House | Transmitted |
2013-05-22 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 163 Yeas 108 Nays 0 |
2013-05-22 | House | Read A Third Time |
2013-05-21 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2013-05-21 | House | Read A Second Time |
2013-05-14 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-05-14 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2013-01-23 | House | Printed Bill Filed 01/23/2013 |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2013-01-22 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced By Representative Earl Poleski |