MI HB4081 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-4)
Status: Engrossed on September 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-10 - Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
Pending: Senate Transportation And Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-10 - Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
Pending: Senate Transportation And Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Highways: memorial; portion of M-57 in Genesee County; designate as the "Firefighter Mike Wager Memorial Highway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2080) by adding sec. 25a.
Title
Highways: memorial; portion of M-57 in Genesee County; designate as the "Firefighter Mike Wager Memorial Highway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2080) by adding sec. 25a.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 188 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2019-09-05 | House | Transmitted |
2019-09-05 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 188 Yeas 109 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2019-09-05 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-09-04 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-09-04 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2019-09-04 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-09-03 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-09-03 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-06-18 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-01-24 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/24/2019 |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2019-01-24 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced By Representative Sheryl Kennedy |