MI HB4081 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Vetoed By The Governor 12/28/2018 12/31/18 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Vetoed By The Governor 12/28/2018 12/31/18 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Gaming; bingo and charitable gaming; millionaire parties; provide for general amendments. Amends secs. 2, 3, 3a, 4, 4a, 8, 9, 10, 11b, 12, 13, 14, 15, 16 & 19 of 1972 PA 382 (MCL 432.102 et seq.); designates secs. 1 to 20 as art. 1; adds art. 2 & repeals secs. 10a, 10b & 20 of 1972 PA 382 (MCL 432.110a et seq.).
Title
Gaming; bingo and charitable gaming; millionaire parties; provide for general amendments. Amends secs. 2, 3, 3a, 4, 4a, 8, 9, 10, 11b, 12, 13, 14, 15, 16 & 19 of 1972 PA 382 (MCL 432.102 et seq.); designates secs. 1 to 20 as art. 1; adds art. 2 & repeals secs. 10a, 10b & 20 of 1972 PA 382 (MCL 432.110a et seq.).
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Barrett [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 1023 (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 80 (Y: 100 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 80 (Y: 100 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | House | Vetoed By The Governor 12/28/2018 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/26/2018 @ 6:48 Pm |
2018-12-20 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-20 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-12-20 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 1023 Yeas 36 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2017-04-27 | House | Transmitted |
2017-04-27 | House | Title Amended |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 80 Yeas 100 Nays 9 |
2017-04-27 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-04-26 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted And Amended |
2017-04-26 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2017-01-25 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/24/2017 |
2017-01-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2017-01-24 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-01-24 | House | Introduced By Representative Tom Barrett |