MI HB4068 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-23 - Printed Bill Filed 01/23/2013
Pending: House Tax Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-23 - Printed Bill Filed 01/23/2013
Pending: House Tax Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Corporate income tax; credits; credit for certain employers that provide employment for certain veterans; create. Amends 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.1 - 206.713) by adding sec. 672a.
Title
Corporate income tax; credits; credit for certain employers that provide employment for certain veterans; create. Amends 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.1 - 206.713) by adding sec. 672a.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-23 | House | Printed Bill Filed 01/23/2013 |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2013-01-22 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced By Representative Charles Smiley |
Same As/Similar To
SB0130 (Same As) 2013-01-31 - Referred To Committee On Finance
Subjects
Corporate income tax, credits
Labor, employment preference
Michigan business tax, credits
Veterans, employment
Labor, employment preference
Michigan business tax, credits
Veterans, employment
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2013-HB-4068 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/billintroduced/House/htm/2013-HIB-4068.htm |