MI HB4066 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 563'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 563'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Health occupations; physicians; interstate medical licensure compact; create. Amends 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1101 - 333.25211) by adding sec. 16189 & repeals sec. 16189.
Title
Health occupations; physicians; interstate medical licensure compact; create. Amends 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1101 - 333.25211) by adding sec. 16189 & repeals sec. 16189.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-19 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 882 (Y: 103 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 795 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 295 (Y: 100 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 795 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 295 (Y: 100 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 563'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2018 @ 3:16 Pm |
2018-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/28/2018 @ 12:01 Pm 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/26/2018 @ 6:40 Pm |
2018-12-19 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-19 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-12-19 | House | Roll Call # 882 Yeas 103 Nays 6 |
2018-12-19 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-12-18 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2018-12-18 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 795 Yeas 36 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-10-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2017-10-10 | House | Transmitted |
2017-10-10 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 295 Yeas 100 Nays 6 |
2017-10-10 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-10-05 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-10-05 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-09-27 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-09-27 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-01-25 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/24/2017 |
2017-01-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2017-01-24 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-01-24 | House | Introduced By Representative Jim Tedder |
Subjects
Health occupations: physicians
Occupations: individual licensing and regulation
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
State: interstate compacts and agreements
Occupations: individual licensing and regulation
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
State: interstate compacts and agreements