MI HB4064 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-12)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Legislature: legislative agencies; ombudsman for public employees; create. Creates new act.
Title
Legislature: legislative agencies; ombudsman for public employees; create. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 165 (Y: 87 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2021-05-05 | House | Transmitted |
2021-05-05 | House | Rep. Sarah Anthony Removed As Cosponsor |
2021-05-05 | House | Rep. Samantha Steckloff Removed As Cosponsor |
2021-05-05 | House | Reps. Regina Weiss, Cynthia Johnson, Rachel Hood Removed As Co-sponsors |
2021-05-05 | House | Title Amended |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 165 Yeas 87 Nays 21 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2021-05-05 | House | Substitute (h-4) Adopted |
2021-05-05 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-04-29 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-04-29 | House | Substitute (h-3) Adopted |
2021-04-29 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-04-22 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-3) |
2021-02-02 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/28/2021 |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2021-01-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-01-28 | House | Introduced By Representative Annette Glenn |
Subjects
Crimes: other
Health: other
Labor: fair employment practices
Labor: public service employment
Legislature: legislative agencies
State financing and management: funds
Health: other
Labor: fair employment practices
Labor: public service employment
Legislature: legislative agencies
State financing and management: funds