MI HB4059 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on November 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-30 - Assigned Pa 111'21
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on November 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-30 - Assigned Pa 111'21
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Human services: medical services; autism evaluation review process requirements for Medicaid benefit eligibility; modify. Amends 1939 PA 280 (MCL 400.1 - 400.119b) by adding sec. 109n.
Title
Human services: medical services; autism evaluation review process requirements for Medicaid benefit eligibility; modify. Amends 1939 PA 280 (MCL 400.1 - 400.119b) by adding sec. 109n.
Sponsors
Rep. Pauline Wendzel [R] | Rep. Ben Frederick [R] | Rep. Mike Mueller [R] | Rep. Douglas Wozniak [R] |
Rep. Robert Bezotte [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-11-02 - House - House Third Reading: Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 516 (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 404 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-10-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 287 (Y: 108 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 404 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-10-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 287 (Y: 108 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-30 | House | Assigned Pa 111'21 |
2021-11-30 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 11/10/2021 04:06 Pm |
2021-11-30 | House | Approved By The Governor 11/10/2021 03:44 Pm |
2021-11-09 | House | Presented To The Governor 11/05/2021 01:33 Pm |
2021-11-02 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2021-11-02 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2021-11-02 | House | Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 516 Yeas 101 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 7 |
2021-10-26 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2021-10-26 | House | Returned From Senate With Amendment(s) With Full Title |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 404 Yeas 34 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Amendment(s) |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) Concurred In |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Amendment(s) |
2021-10-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2021-10-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services |
2021-06-03 | House | Transmitted |
2021-06-03 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 287 Yeas 108 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2021-06-03 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-06-02 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-06-02 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-05-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-05-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-02-02 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/28/2021 |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2021-01-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-01-28 | House | Introduced By Representative Pauline Wendzel |