MI HB4032 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-31 - Assigned Pa 164'19
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-31 - Assigned Pa 164'19
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure: other; supervision fees for probation and parole in code of corrections; modify. Amends secs. 25a, 36a & 85 of 1953 PA 232 (MCL 791.225a et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4031'19
Title
Criminal procedure: other; supervision fees for probation and parole in code of corrections; modify. Amends secs. 25a, 36a & 85 of 1953 PA 232 (MCL 791.225a et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4031'19
Sponsors
Rep. Tommy Brann [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-12-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 365 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 79 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 79 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 164'19 |
2019-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/20/2019 12:56 Pm |
2019-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/20/2019 12:22 Pm |
2019-12-19 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/13/2019 03:27 Pm |
2019-12-19 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2019-12-19 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2019-12-11 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 365 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-12-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2019-12-10 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2019-05-02 | House | Transmitted |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 79 Yeas 109 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2019-05-02 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-04-30 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-04-30 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2019-04-30 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-04-23 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2019-03-15 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/10/2019 |
2019-03-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2019-03-15 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-03-15 | House | Introduced By Representative Tommy Brann |