MI HB4026 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-02 - Assigned Pa 96'21
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-02 - Assigned Pa 96'21
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicles: registration; issuance of 2-year recreation passport; provide for under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 805 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.805). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4117'21, SB 0220'21
Title
Vehicles: registration; issuance of 2-year recreation passport; provide for under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 805 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.805). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4117'21, SB 0220'21
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Eisen [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-10-19 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 479 (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 334 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 90 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 334 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 90 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-02 | House | Assigned Pa 96'21 |
2021-11-02 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/29/2021 11:56 Am |
2021-11-02 | House | Approved By The Governor 10/29/2021 10:13 Am |
2021-10-20 | House | Presented To The Governor 10/20/2021 04:02 Pm |
2021-10-19 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2021-10-19 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2021-10-19 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 479 Yeas 103 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 6 |
2021-10-19 | House | Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2021-07-21 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2021-07-21 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Full Title |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 334 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2021-03-25 | House | Transmitted |
2021-03-25 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 90 Yeas 106 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2021-03-25 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-03-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-03-02 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-03-02 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-01-28 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/27/2021 |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2021-01-27 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced By Representative Gary Eisen |