MI HB4018 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-04 - Referred To Committee On Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-04 - Referred To Committee On Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Natural resources: fishing; illegal taking of sturgeon; revise penalty for. Amends sec. 48738 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.48738).
Title
Natural resources: fishing; illegal taking of sturgeon; revise penalty for. Amends sec. 48738 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.48738).
Sponsors
Rep. Sue Allor [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 181 (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Judiciary With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Judiciary With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2019-09-03 | House | Transmitted |
2019-09-03 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 181 Yeas 107 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2019-09-03 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-08-29 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-08-29 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2019-08-29 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-06-18 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-06-18 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2019-05-21 | House | Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Judiciary With Substitute H-1 |
2019-03-08 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/09/2019 |
2019-03-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources And Outdoor Recreation |
2019-03-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-03-08 | House | Introduced By Representative Sue Allor |