MI HB4012 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Assigned Pa 33'24 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Assigned Pa 33'24 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control: speed restrictions; procedure for establishing speed limits; modify. Amends sec. 628 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.628).
Title
Traffic control: speed restrictions; procedure for establishing speed limits; modify. Amends sec. 628 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.628).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 60 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 355 (Y: 100 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 355 (Y: 100 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | House | Assigned Pa 33'24 With Immediate Effect |
2024-04-09 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 04/02/2024 02:10 Pm |
2024-04-09 | House | Approved By The Governor 04/02/2024 01:16 Pm |
2024-04-09 | House | Presented To The Governor 03/27/2024 11:02 Am |
2024-03-19 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2024-03-19 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2024-03-19 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 60 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2023-10-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2023-10-12 | House | Transmitted |
2023-10-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 355 Yeas 100 Nays 10 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2023-10-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2023-10-12 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2023-10-12 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2023-10-12 | House | Read A Second Time |
2023-06-13 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2023-06-13 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2023-01-17 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/12/2023 |
2023-01-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation, Mobility, And Infrastructure |
2023-01-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-01-12 | House | Introduced By Representative Bradley Slagh |
Subjects
State agencies (existing): transportation
Traffic control: speed restrictions
Traffic control: traffic regulation
Traffic control: speed restrictions
Traffic control: traffic regulation