MI HB4001 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Postponed For The Day
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Individual income tax; rate; annual rollback of rate until zero; provide for. Amends sec. 51 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.51).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Individual income tax; rate; annual rollback of rate until zero; provide for. Amends sec. 51 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.51).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-23 - House - House Third Reading: Defeated Roll Call # 5 (Y: 52 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-23HousePostponed For The Day
2017-02-23HouseMotion To Reconsider
2017-02-23HouseDefeated Roll Call # 5 Yeas 52 Nays 55
2017-02-23HouseAmended
2017-02-23HouseRead A Third Time
2017-02-21HousePlaced On Third Reading
2017-02-21HouseSubstitute H-3 Adopted
2017-02-21HouseRead A Second Time
2017-02-15HouseReferred To Second Reading
2017-02-15HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2017-01-12HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 01/11/2017
2017-01-11HouseReferred To Committee On Tax Policy
2017-01-11HouseRead A First Time
2017-01-11HouseIntroduced By Representative Lee Chatfield

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback