ME LD994 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Promote Public Health by Eliminating Criminal Penalties for Possession of Hypodermic Apparatuses
Title
An Act To Promote Public Health by Eliminating Criminal Penalties for Possession of Hypodermic Apparatuses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-02 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2021-07-02 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-09 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-240) in concurrence |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-240) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-08 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-03 | Senate | On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending motion by Senator DESCHAMBAULT of York to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report in Concurrence. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Senator DESCHAMBAULT of York moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report in Concurrence. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-02 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-240). |
2021-06-02 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-02 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-240) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-02 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-02 | House | On motion of Representative WARREN of Hallowell, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-02 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-05-25 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-04-30 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-04-30 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence |
2021-03-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-10 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2021-03-10 | House | Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed. |