ME LD984 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Develop Plans To Return to the State Children Housed in Residential Treatment Systems outside of the State
Title
Resolve, To Develop Plans To Return to the State Children Housed in Residential Treatment Systems outside of the State
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-29 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-29 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-352), in concurrence. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-352) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-28 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-352). |
2019-05-28 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-05-28 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-02-26 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2019-02-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-26 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2019-02-26 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |