ME LD966 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Establishing the Commission To Study Fair, Equitable and Competitive Tax Policy for Maine's Working Families and Small Businesses To Enable the Implementation of the State's 10-year Economic Development Strategy
Title
Resolve, Establishing the Commission To Study Fair, Equitable and Competitive Tax Policy for Maine's Working Families and Small Businesses To Enable the Implementation of the State's 10-year Economic Development Strategy
Sponsors
Rep. Denise Tepler [D] | Sen. Benjamin Chipman [D] | Rep. Ryan Fecteau [D] | Rep. Ann Matlack [D] |
Rep. Maureen Terry [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-14 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #327 (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2021-07-19 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302 |
2021-06-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence. |
2021-06-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-14 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-560) in concurrence |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-560) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-14 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 327 Yeas 22 - Nays 13 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator CHIPMAN of Cumberland The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-10 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-560). |
2021-06-10 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-10 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-560) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-10 | House | The Resolve was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-10 | House | On motion of Representative TERRY of Gorham, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-10 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-10 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-05-27 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-27 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION in concurrence |
2021-03-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-10 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2021-03-10 | House | Committee on Taxation suggested and ordered printed. |