ME LD964 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Provide Access to Private Apartment Complexes for Political Candidates
Title
An Act To Provide Access to Private Apartment Complexes for Political Candidates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2015-03-19 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-03-19 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to REFERENCE to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator Cyrway of Kennebec REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2015-03-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-03-17 | House | On motion of Representative LUCHINI of Ellsworth, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2015-03-17 | House | Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=964&snum=127 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0663&item=1&snum=127 |