ME LD961 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Provide Equity in Access to Applications for the National School Lunch Program and School Breakfast Program
Title
An Act To Provide Equity in Access to Applications for the National School Lunch Program and School Breakfast Program
Sponsors
Rep. Rebecca Millett [D] | Sen. Nathan Libby [D] | Rep. Sarah Pebworth [D] | Sen. Matthew Pouliot [R] |
Sen. Joseph Rafferty [D] | Rep. Suzanne Salisbury [D] | Rep. Rachel Talbot Ross [D] | Rep. Samuel Zager [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-09 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-360) in concurrence |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-360) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-08 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-08 | Senate | On motion by Senator RAFFERTY of York the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Reports Read |
2021-06-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-07 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-360). |
2021-06-07 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-07 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-360) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-07 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-07 | House | On motion of Representative BRENNAN of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-07 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-05-05 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-05 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2021-03-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-10 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2021-03-10 | House | Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |