ME LD954 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Vetoed on July 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-19 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on July 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-19 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Provide Equal Access to the Benefits of the Maine Food Sovereignty Act
Title
An Act To Provide Equal Access to the Benefits of the Maine Food Sovereignty Act
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Keim [R] | Rep. William Faulkingham [R] | Sen. Chloe Maxmin [D] | Rep. Margaret O'Neil [D] |
Rep. William Pluecker [I] |
Roll Calls
2021-07-19 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #490 (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Recede And Concur RC #435 (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Recede And Concur RC #435 (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-19 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-07-19 | Senate | LD 954 In Senate, July 19, 2021, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 21 and 13, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED. |
2021-06-18 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-17 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 435 Yeas 30 - Nays 4 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-88) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-722) thereto in concurrence |
2021-06-17 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-17 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2021-06-17 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-88) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-722) thereto. |
2021-06-17 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-17 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-88) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-722) thereto was ADOPTED. |
2021-06-17 | House | On motion of Representative O'NEIL of Saco, House Amendment "A" (H-722) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-88) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-17 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-88) was READ. |
2021-06-17 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-17 | House | Subsequently, the Committee Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-17 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2021-06-15 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-10 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-09 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-08 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-07 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-03 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-02 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-05-19 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-05-19 | House | Later today assigned. |
2021-05-19 | House | On motion of Representative DUNPHY of Old Town, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of the Committee Report. |
2021-05-19 | House | The Committee Report was READ. |
2021-05-19 | House | On OBJECTION of Representative DUNPHY of Old Town REMOVED. |
2021-05-19 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-88). |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-88) READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2021-05-14 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2021-04-22 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2021-04-22 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-10 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-10 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |