ME LD951 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-27 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to Amend the State Education Funding Formula to Create Equity Between Municipalities by Adding Median Income to the Formula

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act to Amend the State Education Funding Formula to Create Equity Between Municipalities by Adding Median Income to the Formula

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-27SenatePursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
2023-04-24JointReported Out: ONTP
2023-04-19JointVoted: ONTP
2023-04-19JointWork Session Held
2023-03-30HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594.
2023-03-02SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence
2023-03-02HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-03-02HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
2023-03-02HouseCommittee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback