ME LD949 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Restore the MaineCare Nursing Facility COVID-19 Temporary Rate Increase
Title
Resolve, To Restore the MaineCare Nursing Facility COVID-19 Temporary Rate Increase
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2021-07-19 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302 |
2021-06-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2021-06-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-15 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2021-06-15 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With Report READ and ACCEPTED AND PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-205) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-572) thereto in concurrence |
2021-06-14 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-14 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2021-06-14 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-205) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-572) thereto. |
2021-06-14 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-14 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-205) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-572) thereto was ADOPTED. |
2021-06-14 | House | On motion of Representative MEYER of Eliot, House Amendment "A" (H-572) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-205) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-14 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-205) was READ. |
2021-06-14 | House | The Resolve was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-14 | House | Subsequently, the Committee Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-14 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2021-06-10 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-09 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-09 | House | Later today assigned. |
2021-06-09 | House | On motion of Representative DUNPHY of Old Town, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of the Committee Report. |
2021-06-09 | House | The Committee Report was READ. |
2021-06-09 | House | On OBJECTION of Representative DUNPHY of Old Town REMOVED. |
2021-06-09 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-205). |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-205) READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-08 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2021-05-18 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2021-05-18 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-04-22 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-10 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-10 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |