ME LD939 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Support Maine's Medical Marijuana Program and Ensure Patient Access
Title
An Act To Support Maine's Medical Marijuana Program and Ensure Patient Access
Sponsors
Rep. William Pluecker [I] | Sen. Ned Claxton [D] | Sen. Bradlee Farrin [R] | Sen. Troy Jackson [D] |
Sen. Chloe Maxmin [D] | Sen. David Miramant [D] | Rep. Rachel Talbot Ross [D] | Rep. Lynne Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-14 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-10 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-468) in concurrence |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-468) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-10 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator LUCHINI of Hancock the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Reports Read |
2021-06-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-09 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-468). |
2021-06-09 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-09 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-468) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-09 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-09 | House | On motion of Representative CAIAZZO of Scarborough, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-09 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-08 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-05-24 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-24 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-05-17 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-05-10 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2021-03-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-10 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2021-03-10 | House | Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |