ME LD934 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-22 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-22 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Amend the Laws Governing Damages Awarded for Wrongful Death
Title
An Act to Amend the Laws Governing Damages Awarded for Wrongful Death
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Moonen [D] | Sen. Anne Carney [D] | Rep. Rachel Henderson [R] | Rep. Adam Lee [D] |
Rep. Erin Sheehan [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-21 - Senate - Accept Report 'a' Ought To Pass As Amended RC #438 (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - House - Acc Rep A Otp-am RC #299 (Y: 77 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - House - Acc Rep A Otp-am RC #299 (Y: 77 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-22 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2023-06-22 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-22 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-652) in concurrence |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-652) READ and ADOPTED |
2023-06-21 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 438 Yeas 22 - Nays 12 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2023-06-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland Report A Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-652) ACCEPTED |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Reports READ |
2023-06-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-21 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-652). |
2023-06-21 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2023-06-21 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-652) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2023-06-21 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2023-06-21 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 299 (Yeas 77 - Nays 64 - Absent 9 - Excused 1) |
2023-06-21 | House | On motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED. |
2023-06-21 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-06-20 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP/OTP-AM/OTP-AM/OTP-AM |
2023-04-20 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-04-20 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence |
2023-03-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-03-02 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2023-03-02 | House | Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed. |