ME LD927 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Increase the Availability of Health Care Services by Eliminating the Certificate of Need for All Health Care Services
Title
An Act To Increase the Availability of Health Care Services by Eliminating the Certificate of Need for All Health Care Services
Sponsors
Rep. Laurel Libby [R] | Rep. Amy Arata [R] | Rep. Christopher Caiazzo [D] | Sen. Ned Claxton [D] |
Sen. David Miramant [D] | Rep. Joshua Morris [R] | Rep. Beth O'Connor [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #310 (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #211 (Y: 79 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #211 (Y: 79 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 310 Yeas 21 - Nays 13 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator SANBORN of Cumberland The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-09 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 211 (Yeas 79 - Nays 51 - Absent 21 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-09 | House | On motion of Representative TEPLER of Topsham, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-09 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-08 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2021-04-15 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-04-15 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator Sanborn of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on Health Coverage, Insurance and Financial Services, in concurrence. |
2021-03-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-10 | House | On motion of Representative MEYER of Eliot, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. |
2021-03-10 | House | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed. |