ME LD926 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on July 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-19 - IN POSSESSION OF THE SENATE WHEN THE SENATE ADJOURNED SINE DIE AND PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on July 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-19 - IN POSSESSION OF THE SENATE WHEN THE SENATE ADJOURNED SINE DIE AND PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Ban Biological Males from Participating in Women's Sports
Title
An Act To Ban Biological Males from Participating in Women's Sports
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-17 - House - Acc Report 'a' Ontp RC #379 (Y: 80 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-19 | Senate | IN POSSESSION OF THE SENATE WHEN THE SENATE ADJOURNED SINE DIE AND PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD) |
2021-07-02 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-30 | Senate | On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF ANY REPORT |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-17 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 379 (Yeas 80 - Nays 53 - Absent 18 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-17 | House | On motion of Representative HARNETT of Gardiner, REPORT A Ought Not to Pass was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-17 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-17 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM/OTP-AM |
2021-05-20 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-20 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator Carney of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on Judiciary, in concurrence. |
2021-03-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-10 | House | On motion of Representative BRENNAN of Portland, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2021-03-10 | House | Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed. |