ME LD916 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Protect Data Privacy and Security in Elections
Title
An Act To Protect Data Privacy and Security in Elections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-15 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-15 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-15 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-513) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-266) thereto. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2021-06-14 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-513) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-266) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-513) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-266) thereto READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-14 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-266) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-513) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-14 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under further suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-513) was ADOPTED |
2021-06-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator LUCHINI of Hancock Under suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby this Billl was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-513) |
2021-06-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-14 | House | FAILED PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-14 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-513) in concurrence |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-513) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-10 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator LUCHINI of Hancock The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-09 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-513). |
2021-06-09 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-09 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-513) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-09 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-09 | House | On motion of Representative CAIAZZO of Scarborough, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-09 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-09 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-05-28 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-28 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2021-03-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-10 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2021-03-10 | House | Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |