ME LD911 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-30 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-30 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Amend the Laws Regarding Certain Law Enforcement Interactions and Tools for Determining Residency During Conflict Resolution
Title
An Act to Amend the Laws Regarding Certain Law Enforcement Interactions and Tools for Determining Residency During Conflict Resolution
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-30 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2024-01-30 | Senate | On motion by Senator BEEBE-CENTER of Knox the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Reports Read |
2024-01-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-01-25 | House | On motion of Representative SALISBURY of Westbrook, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2024-01-25 | House | Reports READ. |
2024-01-22 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2023-12-14 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-12-14 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-07-26 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847. |
2023-07-25 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2023-06-01 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2023-04-20 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-02-28 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence |
2023-02-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-02-28 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2023-02-28 | House | Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=911&snum=131 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0567&item=1&snum=131 |