ME LD907 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Ensure That Defendants in Foreclosure Proceedings Receive Proper Notification
Title
An Act To Ensure That Defendants in Foreclosure Proceedings Receive Proper Notification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-12 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-12 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-543), in concurrence. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-543) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-11 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-543). |
2019-06-11 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-06-11 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-02-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator Carpenter of Aroostook, REFERRED to the Committee on Judiciary, in concurrence. |
2019-02-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-19 | House | On motion of Representative TEPLER of Topsham, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2019-02-19 | House | Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES suggested and ordered printed. |