ME LD903 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on June 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-07 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on June 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-07 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Protect Rights and Privileges Granted under the United States Constitution and the Constitution of Maine
Title
An Act To Protect Rights and Privileges Granted under the United States Constitution and the Constitution of Maine
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-30 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #172 (Y: 76 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-07 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Subsequently The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-31 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending her motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report, in concurrence |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Senator KEIM of Oxford moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Reports READ |
2017-05-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-30 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 172 (Yeas 76 - Nays 64 - Absent 10 - Excused 1) |
2017-05-30 | House | On motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-05-30 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence |
2017-03-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-07 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2017-03-07 | House | Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed. |