ME LD90 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Charter of the Rumford Water District
Title
An Act To Amend the Charter of the Rumford Water District
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - House - Indef Pp Sas-226 To Cas-54 RC #359 (Y: 82 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #317 (Y: 91 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Adopt Sas-226 To Cas-54 RC #295 (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #294 (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #317 (Y: 91 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Adopt Sas-226 To Cas-54 RC #295 (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #294 (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2017-06-21 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-21 | House | The House INSISTED on PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-54). |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-06-20 | Senate | On motion by Senator WOODSOME of York The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report AND PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-54) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-226) thereto |
2017-06-20 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-20 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2017-06-20 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-54). |
2017-06-20 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-06-20 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-54) was ADOPTED. |
2017-06-20 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 359 (Yeas 82 - Nays 61 - Absent 8 - Excused 0) |
2017-06-20 | House | Subsequently, Senate Amendment "A" (S-226) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-54) was INDEFINITELY POSTPONED. |
2017-06-20 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2017-06-19 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-16 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-15 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-15 | House | Later today assigned. (Roll Call Ordered) |
2017-06-15 | House | On motion of Representative GOLDEN of Lewiston, TABLED pending the motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham to INDEFINITELY POSTPONE Senate Amendment "A" (S-226) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-54). |
2017-06-15 | House | Representative ESPLING of New Gloucester REQUESTED a Roll Call. More than one-fifth of the members present expressed a desire for a roll call, which was ORDERED. |
2017-06-15 | House | Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham MOVED to INDEFINITELY POSTPONE Senate Amendment "A" (S-226) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-54). |
2017-06-15 | House | On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, the House RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Senate Amendment "A" (S-226) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-54). |
2017-06-15 | House | Senate Amendment "A" (S-226) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-54) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-06-15 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-54) was READ. |
2017-06-15 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-06-15 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 317 (Yeas 91 - Nays 50 - Absent 10 - Excused 0) |
2017-06-15 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-06-15 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2017-06-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-14 | House | Later today assigned. (Roll Call Ordered) |
2017-06-14 | House | On motion of Representative GOLDEN of Lewiston, TABLED pending the motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2017-06-14 | House | Representative ESPLING of New Gloucester REQUESTED a Roll Call. More than one-fifth of the members present expressed a desire for a roll call, which was ORDERED. |
2017-06-14 | House | Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2017-06-14 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-54) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-226) thereto |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-54) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-226) thereto ADOPTED |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 295 Yeas 19 - Nays 16 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2017-06-13 | Senate | On motion by Senator KEIM of Oxford Senate Amendment "A" (S-226) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-54) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-54) READ |
2017-06-13 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 294 Yeas 19 - Nays 16 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2017-06-13 | Senate | On motion by Senator WOODSOME of York The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President ProTem |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-02 | Senate | On motion by Senator WOODSOME of York Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Reports READ |
2017-01-17 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-01-17 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-01-17 | Senate | REFERENCE to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY |
2017-01-17 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY |