ME LD898 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Provide for Support for New Educators

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Provide for Support for New Educators

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-09 - House - Enactment RC #87 (Y: 84 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #73 (Y: 86 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-06-19HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-19HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-06-19HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-19HouseThe House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-59) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-332) thereto.
2019-06-19SenateSent down for concurrence
2019-06-19SenatePASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-59) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-332) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
2019-06-19SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-59) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-332) thereto ADOPTED
2019-06-19SenateOn further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-332) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-59) READ and ADOPTED
2019-06-19SenateUnder further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (S-59) was ADOPTED
2019-06-19SenateUnder suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-59)
2019-06-19SenateOn Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
2019-05-14SenateOn motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-05-09HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-09HouseROLL CALL NO. 87 (Yeas 84 - Nays 54 - Absent 11 - Excused 1 Vacant 1)
2019-05-09HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-05-07HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-07HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-59).
2019-05-07HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2019-05-07HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (S-59) was READ and ADOPTED.
2019-05-07HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2019-05-07HouseROLL CALL NO. 73 (Yeas 86 - Nays 56 - Absent 7 - Excused 1 Vacant 1)
2019-05-07HouseOn motion of Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2019-05-07HouseSpeaker laid before the House
2019-05-02HouseUnfinished Business
2019-04-30HouseUnfinished Business
2019-04-30HouseLater today assigned.
2019-04-30HouseOn motion of Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report.
2019-04-30HouseReports READ.
2019-04-25SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2019-04-25SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-59)
2019-04-25SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-59) READ and ADOPTED
2019-04-25SenateREAD ONCE
2019-04-25SenateOn motion by Senator MILLETT of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED.
2019-04-25SenateReports Read
2019-02-19HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-02-19HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
2019-02-19SenateCommittee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback