ME LD886 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Protect Search and Rescue Volunteers Certified by the Maine Association for Search and Rescue from Adverse Employment Actions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Protect Search and Rescue Volunteers Certified by the Maine Association for Search and Rescue from Adverse Employment Actions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-06 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #213 (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-06-07HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-07HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-06-06SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-447) in concurrence
2019-06-06SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-447) READ and ADOPTED
2019-06-06SenateREAD ONCE
2019-06-06SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 213 Yeas 19 - Nays 13 - Excused 3 - Absent 0
2019-06-06SenateOn motion by Senator BELLOWS of Kennebec the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED.
2019-06-06SenateReports Read
2019-06-05HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-05HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-447).
2019-06-05HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2019-06-05HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-447) was READ and ADOPTED.
2019-06-05HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2019-06-05HouseOn motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2019-06-05HouseReports READ.
2019-02-19SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING in concurrence
2019-02-19HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-02-19HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING.
2019-02-19HouseCommittee on Labor and Housing suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback